OK SB378 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB378
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drive licenses; examination of applicants; allowing certain technology schools to be examiners; curriculum and training; background check. Effective date.
Title
Drive licenses; examination of applicants; allowing certain technology schools to be examiners; curriculum and training; background check. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens |
2019-04-18 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB378 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019