OK SB392 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; modifying limit for surviving spouse of disabled veterans; clarifying certain determination. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax exemption; modifying limit for surviving spouse of disabled veterans; clarifying certain determination. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Veterans & Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Veterans & Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB392 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee