OK SB396 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Civil rights enforcement; transferring duties to the Attorney General's Office of Civil Rights Enforcement. Emergency.
Title
Civil rights enforcement; transferring duties to the Attorney General's Office of Civil Rights Enforcement. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-15 | House | Amended |
2013-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton, Williams |
2013-04-15 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 13 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 14 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1505 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 163 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |