OK SB4 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Vetoed 04/08/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Vetoed 04/08/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; requiring proof of identity to vote; providing exceptions; providing for provisional ballots. Effective date.
Title
Elections; requiring proof of identity to vote; providing exceptions; providing for provisional ballots. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Vetoed 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Veto message read | |
2009-04-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-01 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 27 | |
2009-04-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Martin (Steve), Nelson, Derby, Ortega, Wright (Harold), Moore | |
2009-04-01 | General Order | |
2009-03-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Trebilcock | |
2009-03-26 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 | |
2009-03-10 | coauthored by Coffee, Lamb, Brogdon, Crain, Newberry, Myers, Halligan, Stanislawski, Schulz, Bingman, Barrington, Russell, Justice, Marlatt, Brown, Johnson (Mike), Reynolds, Branan | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-19 | coauthored by Tibbs (principal House author) | |
2009-02-19 | coauthored by Sykes | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-17 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sykes | |
2009-02-04 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 14 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 16 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 115 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |