OK SB410 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans agencies; appointment and confirmation requirements for certain positions. Effective date.
Title
Veterans agencies; appointment and confirmation requirements for certain positions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB410 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 14 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |