OK SB433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Negligence; limiting liability for certain emergency care. Effective date.
Title
Negligence; limiting liability for certain emergency care. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |