OK SB435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Regional Emergency 9-1-1 Services Act; public safety answering points. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; Regional Emergency 9-1-1 Services Act; public safety answering points. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | Emergency added |
2024-04-23 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-04-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-17 | House | Remove Senator Montgomery as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Seifried |
2024-04-11 | House | Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative ODonnell |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB435 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee