OK SB513 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB513
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Remove as author Senator Shortey; authored by Senator David
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Remove as author Senator Shortey; authored by Senator David
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical parole; modifying who may be put on the docket. Effective date.
Title
Medical parole; modifying who may be put on the docket. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Shortey; authored by Senator David |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shortey |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB513 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Remove as author Senator Shortey; authored by Senator David