OK SB519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB519
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - HAs rejected, conference requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - HAs rejected, conference requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioners of the Land Office; rulemaking; hearing; notice to lessees prior to taking certain action. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Commissioners of the Land Office; rulemaking; hearing; notice to lessees prior to taking certain action. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2024-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-17 | House | Title restored |
2024-04-17 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-17 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-17 | House | General Order |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2023-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brooks |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB519 (Carry Over) 2023-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken