OK SB582 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying use of credit scores in certain policies. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying use of credit scores in certain policies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB582 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - Enacting clause stricken