OK SB586 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Vetoed 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Vetoed 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by federally recognized Indian tribes or a statewide organization that represents and whose members are public school teachers. Effective date.
Title
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by federally recognized Indian tribes or a statewide organization that represents and whose members are public school teachers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Vetoed 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Veto message read | |
2009-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2009-05-06 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-16 | HAs read | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 18 | |
2009-04-15 | General Order | |
2009-04-09 | Title restored | |
2009-04-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-04-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Shumate (principal House author) | |
2009-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Shumate | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |