OK SB602 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; enacting the Let the Troops Vote Act; modifying various election dates and procedures. Noncodification. Effective date.
Title
Elections; enacting the Let the Troops Vote Act; modifying various election dates and procedures. Noncodification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] |
Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Marlatt, Treat, Allen, David, Shortey, Brinkley, Fields, Brecheen | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-22 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 1 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 1 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 13 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 104 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 20 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 20 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 3 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 4 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |