OK SB631 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB631
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Retirement System; reinstating annual retirement pay for certain members. Effective dates. Emergency.
Title
Law Enforcement Retirement System; reinstating annual retirement pay for certain members. Effective dates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Sen. Tom Woods [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-25 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-25 | House | Title restored |
2024-04-25 | House | Amended |
2024-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2024-04-25 | House | General Order |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-01 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Woods |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Emergency added |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB631 (Carry Over) 2023-07-25 - Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Garvin