OK SB654 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB654
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual assault forensic collection kits; creating a task force to audit untested kits. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sexual assault forensic collection kits; creating a task force to audit untested kits. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB654 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections