OK SB661 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB661
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Small claims procedure; jurisdiction and transfer; transfer from small claims docket. Effective date.
Title
Small claims procedure; jurisdiction and transfer; transfer from small claims docket. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10 |
2017-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-23 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2017-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Sparks, Sykes, Standridge, Newhouse, Pugh, Floyd, Smalley |
2017-05-19 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 22 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-30 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB661 (Carry Over) 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017