OK SB75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB75
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Scenic Rivers; expanding scenic river area on Illinois River. Effective date.
Title
Scenic Rivers; expanding scenic river area on Illinois River. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB75 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee