OK SB77 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB77
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opiate antagonists; permitting certain persons to administer. Effective date.
Title
Opiate antagonists; permitting certain persons to administer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB77 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017