OK SB772 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Business and Professional License Facilitation Task Force; study of governmental models. Emergency.
Title
Business and Professional License Facilitation Task Force; study of governmental models. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | To Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 20; Ayes: 61 Nays: 35 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-18 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency added | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-09 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-27 | HAs read | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 27; Ayes: 47 Nays: 27 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Murphey | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5003 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |