OK SB780 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; raising fine for improper disposal of wildlife; one-day fishing license; fee. Effective date.
Title
Game and fish; raising fine for improper disposal of wildlife; one-day fishing license; fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 31 |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | General Order |
2013-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by McCall (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 7 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |