OK SB801 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; providing for insurance coverage of portable electronics. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; providing for insurance coverage of portable electronics. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-13 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8 | |
2011-04-13 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9 | |
2011-04-11 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Key | |
2011-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 66 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Key (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6636 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6670 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6674 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |