OK SB804 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vision plans; modifying provisions relating to plans to state employees and retirees.
Title
Vision plans; modifying provisions relating to plans to state employees and retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion expired |
2016-04-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Jeff) |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 29; Ayes: 64 Nays: 28 |
2016-04-21 | House | Emergency restored |
2016-04-21 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-21 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-04-21 | House | Considered |
2015-04-15 | House | Laid over |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on Third Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 29 |
2015-04-15 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Jeff) |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 57 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-13 | House | Title stricken |
2015-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (Jeff) (principal House author) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Emergency added |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |