OK SB806 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB806
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; providing nutrition standards; eliminating screen time. Effective date.
Title
Child care; providing nutrition standards; eliminating screen time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-06 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 32 |
2017-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2017-04-05 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB806 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments