OK SB838 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB838
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle license and registration taxes and fees; requiring certain formula updates to be submitted to specified officials. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicle license and registration taxes and fees; requiring certain formula updates to be submitted to specified officials. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB838 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar