OK SB847 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Creating Oklahoma Pension Stabilization Fund; providing for transfer and allocation of certain surplus funds.
Title
Creating Oklahoma Pension Stabilization Fund; providing for transfer and allocation of certain surplus funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-30 | Senate | coauthored by Schulz, Newberry |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2013-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 12; Ayes: 54 Nays: 30 |
2013-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Mulready, Sherrer, Hoskin |
2013-04-23 | House | General Order |
2013-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |