OK SB895 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Investigation Bureau, appointment of special officers with enforcement authority related to oil field larceny. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Investigation Bureau, appointment of special officers with enforcement authority related to oil field larceny. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Danny Morgan [D] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morgan | |
2011-04-06 | Remove Representative Christian as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jackson | |
2011-04-06 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Christian (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1760 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 6 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 150 | 13A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |