OK SB908 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Corrections; authorizing certain persons to retain sidearms upon retirement. Effective date.
Title
Department of Corrections; authorizing certain persons to retain sidearms upon retirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Babinec (principal House author) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |