OK SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB92
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School accreditation; standards for accreditation; evaluation of public schools; school plans. Effective date.
Title
School accreditation; standards for accreditation; evaluation of public schools; school plans. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-23 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2019-04-23 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended |
2019-04-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB92 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019