OK SB928 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roofing contractors; exempting charitable entities; contract cancellation for denial of insurance claim. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Roofing contractors; exempting charitable entities; contract cancellation for denial of insurance claim. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Jordan [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-27 | HAs read | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0; Ayes: 50 Nays: 20 | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | |
2011-04-26 | Remove Representative Jordan as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sullivan | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | Title restored | |
2011-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1151 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |