OK SB933 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; accreditation standards; changing effect of certain conditions upon reduction of certain amount; textbook adoption. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; accreditation standards; changing effect of certain conditions upon reduction of certain amount; textbook adoption. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-21 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-03-28 | House | Emergency added |
2016-03-28 | House | Title restored |
2016-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 16 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 16 | 114a | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 167 | New Code | See Bill Text |