OK SB950 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animals; creating the Pet Store Licensing Act; requiring license for the sale of dogs. Effective date.
Title
Animals; creating the Pet Store Licensing Act; requiring license for the sale of dogs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | House | Title stricken |
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB950 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken