OK SB953 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Safety; driver license reinstatement fee. Effective date.
Title
Public Safety; driver license reinstatement fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 53 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 53 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2011-05-04 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 32; Ayes: 53 Nays: 33 | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 32 | |
2011-04-26 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Billy | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 41 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |