OK SB990 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Open Records Act; requiring blocking of information on specified documents. Effective date.
Title
Open Records Act; requiring blocking of information on specified documents. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-03-31 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2009-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Government Modernization Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Steele (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Steele | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Laster | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |