OK SCR6 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Concurrent resolution; adopting Joint Rules for the 54th Oklahoma Legislature.
Title
Concurrent resolution; adopting Joint Rules for the 54th Oklahoma Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House: ADOPT RESOLUTION (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2013-02-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-02-11 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-02-11 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-02-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2013-02-07 | House | Ayes: 69 Nays: 27 |
2013-02-07 | House | Amended |
2013-02-07 | House | Considered |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Considered |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |