OK SJR4 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution; applying to U.S. Congress for convention of states under Article V of U.S. Constitution.
Title
Joint Resolution; applying to U.S. Congress for convention of states under Article V of U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] |
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Bill Brown [R] |
Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE RES OLVING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE RES OLVING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading rescinded |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 34 |
2015-04-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 56 |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-04-21 | House | Resolving clause restored |
2015-04-21 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | House | Amended |
2015-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman, McCullough |
2015-04-21 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Resolving clause stricken |
2015-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Lepak |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Moore |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Marlatt |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen, Brown, Yen |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Griffin, Marlatt, Shaw, Bingman |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Crain |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |