OK SJR61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating the Oklahoma Business Activity Tax Code; creating the Task Force on Comprehensive Tax Reform.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating the Oklahoma Business Activity Tax Code; creating the Task Force on Comprehensive Tax Reform.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] | Rep. John Trebilcock [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-21 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R CCR (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R CCR (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-21 - House - House: R APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | To Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-21 | Ayes: 90 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | Laid over | |
2010-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan, Trebilcock | |
2010-05-21 | Considered | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy), Derby | |
2010-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Hickman, Miller, Brannon, Jones, Trebilcock, Pruett, McPeak | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-21 | HAs read | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 13 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Resolving clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 1142 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2370 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
ART 10 | 8F | Amended Code | See Bill Text |