OK SJR72 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approving in whole certain subject matter standards; directing distribution.
Title
Approving in whole certain subject matter standards; directing distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion expired |
2018-05-03 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Baker |
2018-05-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1; Ayes: 62 Nays: 22 |
2018-05-03 | House | General Order |
2018-05-01 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2018-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |