OK SR35 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; declaring April 16, 2024, as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; recognizing and celebrating agriculture's impact on our state's heritage and economy; and directing distribution.
Title
Resolution; declaring April 16, 2024, as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; recognizing and celebrating agriculture's impact on our state's heritage and economy; and directing distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2024-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |