OR HB2003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 640, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 640, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Housing and Community Services Department with Department of Land Conservation and Development and Oregon Department of Administrative Services to develop methodology to conduct regional housing needs analysis and, for certain cities and Metro, to estimate existing housing stock, to establish housing shortage analysis and to estimate needed housing units for next 20 years. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to implement analyses and inventory by September 1, 2020. Requires Housing and Community Services Department and Department of Land Conservation and Development to report results to committee of Legislative Assembly by March 1, 2021. Requires Department of Land Conservation and Development to report evaluation to committee of Legislative Assembly no later than March 1, 2021. Appropriates funds to Housing and Community Services Department for analyses. Requires each city outside Metro with population greater than 10,000 to estimate its housing need and capacity no less than once every eight years and Metro and cities within Metro to estimate their housing need and capacity no less than every six years. Requires such local governments, within one year of determining estimated housing need, to adopt housing production strategy to meet estimated housing need. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to identify cities that experience difficulties implementing housing production strategy. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Land Conservation and Development to assist cities with implementation of housing production strategy. Allows Department of Land Conservation and Development to seek enforcement order against cities not implementing housing production strategy. Requires each city to complete Department of Land Conservation and Development housing survey 24 months before determining housing production strategy. Allows development or rezoning of public property in urban growth boundary for affordable housing if compatible with surrounding zoning. Requires local governments to amend local land use laws to comply with 2017 accessory dwelling unit laws by effective date of Act. Requires local government to adopt findings supported by substantial evidence in support of necessity of reduction in density or height in housing development application. Allows nonresidential places of worship to develop multiple affordable dwellings on land where nonresidential place of worship is allowed use. Prohibits professional disciplinary conduct against employees of Department of Consumer and Business Services who provide certain typical building plans and specifications. Appropriates funds to Department of Land Conservation and Development for technical assistance to local governments in implementing Act. Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to buildings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 640, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon. |
2019-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third Reading. Motion to re-refer to Ways and Means carried. Re-referred. |
2019-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |