OR HB2266 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 39, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 39, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies membership of State Interoperability Executive Council. Modifies membership of State Interoperability Executive Council.
Title
Relating to the State Interoperability Executive Council.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Chapter 39, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Bonham, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Carried over to 04-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Carried over to 04-13 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Carried over to 04-12 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Carried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Carried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Carried over to 04-04 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-29 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Carried over to 03-28 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Carried over to 03-27 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Carried over to 03-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-02-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2023-02-07 | House | Second reading. |
2023-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-01-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |