OR HB2486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 403, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 403, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Real Estate Agency to electronically facilitate condominium reporting process. Reduces number of signatures required on reports.
Title
Relating to condominium reports.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 403, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-04 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 55; Absent, 1--Gorsek; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |