OR HB2501 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 735, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 735, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reestablishes Small School District Supplement Fund.
Title
Relating to distributions of state moneys for schools; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 735, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McKeown. |
2013-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |