OR HB2579 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 590, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 590, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands types of entities that may receive grant from Farm-to-School Grant Program to purchase food produced or processed in state or to identify sources of foods or to process foods. Expands purposes for which grant may be used. Creates grant to encourage and sustain successful efforts related to program. Expands types of entities that may receive grant for food-based, agriculture-based or garden-based educational activities. Directs Department of Education to evaluate effectiveness of program and to ensure that technical assistance, training and resources are provided to certain entities. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the Farm-to-School Grant Program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 590, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Taylor. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem. |
2019-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-12 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-06-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |