OR HB2932 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 625, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 625, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs law enforcement unit to participate in National Use-of-Force Data Collection operated by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Directs law enforcement unit to participate in National Use-of-Force Data Collection operated by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to analyze data from National Use-of-Force Data Collection and report annually to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on analysis. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission and Department of Corrections for purposes of implementing provisions of Act.
Title
Relating to the use of physical force.
Sponsors
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 625, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |