OR HB3175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Directs public universities and community colleges to increase voter registration access and information.
Title
Relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 26--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |