OR HB3427 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public university to submit any proposed change in affiliation with athletic association, conference or organization with authority over intercollegiate sports to appropriate legislative committees for review. Requires public university to submit any proposed change in affiliation with athletic association, conference or organization with authority over intercollegiate sports to appropriate legislative committees for review. Prohibits change in affiliation from occurring unless change is first approved by Legislative Assembly.
Title
Relating to intercollegiate sports.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |