OR HB3450 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 660, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 660, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows city with population greater than 75,000 not within metropolitan service district to adopt changes to its comprehensive plan and land use regulations authorizing mixed-use housing within up to 40 acres of lands zoned for employment uses. Allows city with population greater than 75,000 not within metropolitan service district to adopt changes to its comprehensive plan and land use regulations authorizing mixed-use housing within up to 40 acres of lands zoned for employment uses. Requires submission of adopted changes to Land Conservation and Development Commission for review. Sunsets January 2, 2024.
Title
Relating to mixed-use housing within employment lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 660, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helt. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 2--Doherty, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |