OR HB3633 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 68, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 68, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to community-based renewable energy projects; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to community-based renewable energy projects; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Chapter 68, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Ferrioli, George, Kruse. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-23 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-23 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Gilman; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-18 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2010-02-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-11 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Sustainability and Economic Development. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |