OR HB3672 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 730, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 730, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax expenditures; appropriating money; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to tax expenditures; appropriating money; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chapter 730, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011. | |
2011-08-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Third reading. Carried by Burdick, Morse. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 1--George; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-22 | Referred to Tax Credits. | |
2011-06-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-22 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bailey, Smith G.. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Bailey,Berger. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Beyer, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 22, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-14 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-20 | Referred to Tax Credits. | |
2011-05-19 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |