OR HB4015 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund. Appropriates fund moneys to State Department of Fish and Wildlife for carrying out activities serving to protect, maintain or enhance fish and wildlife resources in Oregon. Establishes Oregon Conservation and Recreation Advisory Committee to review department policies regarding use of fund moneys and make recommendations regarding use of fund moneys for implementing and administering department activities. Provides for transferring specified amount of moneys from General Fund to Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund for biennium ending June 30, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |