OR HB4015 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 25, (2024 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 25, (2024 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a person who wants to build a battery energy storage system (BESS) to choose to use EFSC for the siting of the BESS. Permits the ruling body of a local body after talking with the person who wants to build a BESS to choose to use EFSC for the siting of the BESS. Permits a BESS to be built and run without its own site certificate if the BESS is subject to the site certificate of another energy facility. Defines BESS. The Act takes effect on the 91st day after sine die. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.0). Permits a developer of a facility or the governing body of a local government after consulting with the developer to elect to defer regulatory authority to the Energy Facility Siting Council for the siting of a battery energy storage system. Permits a battery energy storage system that is under the regulatory authority of the Energy Facility Siting Council to be constructed and operated without a separate site certificate if the battery energy storage system is subject to a site certificate for another energy facility. Defines "battery energy storage system." Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to battery energy storage systems; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 25, (2024 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Thatcher, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote nay. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Carried over to 03-05 by unanimous consent. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 13--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hieb, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Wallan, Yunker; Excused, 1--Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Stout, Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-02-15 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |